Maths Quiz of the Day-II

Maths Quiz of the Day – II For SSC MTS : 24-08-2019

Q.1 1, 6, 36, 240, ?, 19660
(1) 1440
(2) 1960
(3) 1680
(4) 2160
(5) 1740

Q.2 90, ? , 736, 1089, 1462
(1) 296
(2) 363
(3) 403
(4) 508
(5) 396

Q.3 7, 15, ? , 117, 473, 2369
(1) 42
(2) 33
(3) 27
(4) 48
(5) 37

Q.4 713, 457, 329, ? 233
(1) 276
(2) 284
(3) 270
(4) 265
(5) 256

Q.5 What is the difference between the numbers of girls participated in Dance and the number of boys participated in Solo song?
(1) 115
(2) 90
(3) 104
(4) 95
(5) None of these

Q.6 What is the ratio between the number of boys participated in Dance and the of girls participated in Solo song?
(1) 35:36
(2) 35:56
(3) 1:3
(4) 2:5
(5) 24:25

Q.7 The total number of boys participated in Dance and Solo song together is what percent of the number of girls participated in Group song?
(1) 72%
(2) 80%
(3) 85%
(4) 70%
(5) None of these

Q.8 What is the average of the number children participated in Group song and Solo song?
(1) 484
(2) 414
(3) 464
(4) 441
(5) None of these

Q.9 Two train S and E are running on parallel tracks in the same direction. Train S which is coming from behind takes 70 seconds to cross train E completely. One person in train S observes that he crosses train E in 40 seconds. The speed of the train S and train E is the ratio of 2:1, what is ratio of their lengths?
(1) 3:4
(2) 2:3
(3) 5:4
(4) 5:6
(5) None of these

Q.10 The profit earned after selling an article for Rs. 696 is the same as the loss incurred after selling the article for Rs. 512. What is the cost price (In Rs.) of the article?
(1) Rs. 608
(2) Rs. 812
(3) Rs. 594
(4) None of these
(5) Rs.648

 

Solutions:

 

Ans.1(2)         1×2+2×2=6

                    6×4+4×3=36

                    36×6+6×4=240

                    240×8+8×5=1960

                    1960×10+10×6=1966

Ans.2(3)         03×30 = 90

                    13×31 = 403

                    23×32 = 736

                    33×33 = 1089

                    43×34 = 1462

Ans.3(5)        7×1+32-1=15

                    15×2+32-2=37

                    37×3+32-3=117

                    117×4+32-4=473

                    473×5+32-5=2369

Ans.4(4)         713-256=457

                    457-128=329

                    329-64=265

                    265-32=233 

Ans.5(5)       Required difference = 189-84=105

Ans.6(2)       Required ratio = 105/168 = 35/56

Ans.7(5)       Required % = ((105+84))/252 ×100

                   = 75%

Ans.8(4)       Required average =((378+252)+(84+168))/2

                    = (630+252)/2

                    = 882/2   = 441

 

NO COMMENTS:

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *